NH SB445 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - Pending Motion, Ought to Pass; 03/03/2016; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - Pending Motion, Ought to Pass; 03/03/2016; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Suspending the registration fee for the sale of municipal bonds in New Hampshire for 2 years.
Title
Suspending the registration fee for the sale of municipal bonds in New Hampshire for 2 years.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] | Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
Sen. David Boutin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Senate | Pending Motion, Ought to Pass; 03/03/2016; Senate Journal 7 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Sen. D'Allesandro Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/03/2016; Senate Journal 7 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0572s, Division Vote. 8Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 03/03/2016 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0572s, 03/03/2016; Senate Calendar 7 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Hearing: ===RECONVENE=== 02/02/2016, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Hearing: ===RECESSED=== 01/19/2016, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 1 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 1 |