NH SB44 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-18 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 2, Pg.63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-18 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 2, Pg.63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to payment of rent pending a landlord-tenant action.
Title
Relative to payment of rent pending a landlord-tenant action.
Sponsors
Sen. David Boutin [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Winfred Hutchinson [R] | Rep. William Infantine [R] |
Rep. Shawn Jasper [R] | Rep. Sherman Packard [R] | Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-18 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 2, Pg.63 | |
2012-01-12 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/18/12; Senate Calendar 3 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.229 | |
2011-03-22 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/30/11; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Hearing: 3/17/11, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary, Senate Journal 3, Pg.33 |