NH SB438 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to state procurement policies intended to promote the use of American materials and certain cosmetology licensure requirements.
Title
Relative to state procurement policies intended to promote the use of American materials and certain cosmetology licensure requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 170 N: 129 NV: 37 Abs: 53) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - OTPA (Y: 170 N: 151 NV: 21 Abs: 47) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - OTPA (Y: 170 N: 151 NV: 21 Abs: 47) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1933h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-05-04 | House | FLAM # 1933h (Reps. Turcotte, Osborne): Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 170-129 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-04-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 18-3; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-22 | House | Executive Session: 04/27/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-04-22 | House | Division Work Session: 04/26/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2022-04-21 | House | Referred to Finance 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-21 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1422h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 170-151 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-21 | House | Amendment # 2022-1422h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-04-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1422h (Vote 13-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 16 |
2022-04-13 | House | Executive Session: 04/08/2022 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/08/2022 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/31/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/31/2022; Senate Calendar 13 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0836s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0836s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0836s, 03/17/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Hearing: 01/13/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 2 |
2021-12-30 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |