NH SB437 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on June 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-21 - II. Remainder Effective 06/16/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on June 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-21 - II. Remainder Effective 06/16/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to address child hunger in New Hampshire.
Title
Establishing a commission to address child hunger in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-21 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 06/16/2016 |
2016-06-21 | Senate | I. Section 2 Effective 09/01/2017 |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/16/2016; Chapter 0269 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-07 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 61 |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2116e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2116e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 57 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved to Concur with House Amendment # 1676h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/19/2016; Senate Journal 18 |
2016-05-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1676h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 6 |
2016-05-11 | House | Amendment #2016-1676h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 6 |
2016-05-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1676h for 05/11/2016 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 6 |
2016-04-27 | House | Executive Session: 05/03/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2016-03-22 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2016 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2016-02-17 | House | Introduced 02/11/2016 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 17 P. 51 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0385s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/11/2016; Senate Journal 5 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0385s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/11/2016 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0385s, 02/11/2016; Senate Calendar 5 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Hearing: 02/02/2016, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |