NH SB435 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Making an appropriation to the department of education for the purpose of funding the Hudson CTE center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making an appropriation to the department of education for the purpose of funding the Hudson CTE center.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-23HouseDied on Table
2020-06-30HouseVacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 4
2020-03-02HouseIntroduced 02/20/2020 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 5 P. 56
2020-02-13SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0473s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4
2020-02-13SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-0473s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4
2020-02-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0473s, 02/13/2020; Senate Calendar 6
2020-01-15SenateHearing: 01/21/2020, Room 103, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 3
2020-01-08SenateTo Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback