NH SB435 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the reporting of the unauthorized diversion of controlled drugs.
Title
Relative to the reporting of the unauthorized diversion of controlled drugs.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Sherman Packard [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Frank Kotowski [R] |
Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/24/2016; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Hearing: 01/19/2016, Room 100, State House, 09:35 am; Senate Calendar 1 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |