NH SB432 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-01 - Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/27/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-01 - Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/27/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to itemized bills for medical services.
Title
Relative to itemized bills for medical services.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Rep. David Bates [R] |
Rep. Edward Butler [D] | Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-01 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/27/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-05-11 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 11 |
2016-05-05 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 05/11/2016 (Vote 17-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 1 |
2016-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/26/2016 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-04-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/19/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2016-04-06 | House | Public Hearing: 04/14/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2016-03-29 | House | Introduced 03/23/2016 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 27 P. 68 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 1091s and 1133s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Floor Amendment #2016-1133s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1091s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2016 Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1091s, 03/24/2016; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Hearing: 02/02/2016, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 03:10 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |