NH SB431 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to non-academic surveys required to be filed by school districts to maintain federal funding.
Title
Relative to non-academic surveys required to be filed by school districts to maintain federal funding.
Sponsors
Sen. James Gray [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 9 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Special Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/22/2018; Senate Calendar 8 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Special Order to 02/22/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/15/2018 Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7 |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Hearing: 01/23/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 2 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1 |