NH SB430 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Sen. Bradley Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Sen. Bradley Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to health and human services.
Title
Relative to health and human services.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 167 N: 147 NV: 30 Abs: 45) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - OTPA (Y: 233 N: 90 NV: 26 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - OTPA (Y: 233 N: 90 NV: 26 Abs: 40) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1909h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-05-04 | House | FLAM # 1909h (Rep. Edwards): Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 167-147 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-05-04 | House | Amendment # 1883h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1883h (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-22 | House | Division Work Session: 04/26/2022 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-04-22 | House | Division Work Session: 04/25/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-04-22 | House | Executive Session: 04/27/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-04-21 | House | Referred to Finance 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-21 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1484h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 233-90 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-21 | House | Amendment # 2022-1484h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1484h (Vote 19-1; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-14 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2022 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2022 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/31/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1273s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1273s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1273s, 03/31/2022; Senate Calendar 13A |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0642s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0642s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0642s, 02/16/2022; Senate Calendar 7 |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/27/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2021-12-30 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |