NH SB423 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to noncompete clauses for low-wage employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to noncompete clauses for low-wage employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Sen. Watters Floor Amendment 1041s (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 9 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
2018-03-15SenateSen. Sanborn Moved Inexpedient to Legislate; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
2018-03-15SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Motion Failed; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
2018-03-15SenateSen. Watters Floor Amendment # 2018-1041s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
2018-03-15SenateSen. Watters Withdraws Floor Amendment # 2018-1018s; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
2018-03-14SenateFloor Amendment # 2018-1018s, Pending Motion; 03/15/2018;
2018-03-14SenateSpecial Order to 03/15/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/14/2018 Senate Journal 7
2018-03-12SenateFloor Amendment # 2018-1018s, Pending Motion; 03/14/2018; Senate Calendar 11
2018-03-08SenateSpecial Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-08SenateSen. Watters Offered Floor Amendment # 2018-1018s; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-08SenateSen. Watters Moved Ought to Pass; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-08SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 9Y-14N, Motion Failed; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 10A
2018-01-24Senate===ROOM CHANGE=== Hearing: 02/06/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 5
2017-12-20SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2843&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB423
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=1859&txtFormat=html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=83&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0423&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB423&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2843
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=117&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0423&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB423&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2843
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=118&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0423&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB423&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2843
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=119&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0423&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB423&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2843

Bill Comments

feedback