NH SB423 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by the Governor on 06/03/2016; Chapter 0185; Effective 08/02/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the right of 17-year olds to register to vote.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the right of 17-year olds to register to vote.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-10SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/03/2016; Chapter 0185; Effective 08/02/2016
2016-05-23SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19
2016-05-23HouseEnrolled 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 24
2016-05-11HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 193-142 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 64
2016-04-21HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/11/2016 (Vote 10-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 20
2016-04-12House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/19/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2016-03-30House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/12/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2016-03-30HousePublic Hearing: 04/05/2016 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308
2016-03-29HouseIntroduced 03/23/2016 and referred to Election Law House Journal 27 P. 68
2016-03-24SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 1086s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10
2016-03-24SenateCommittee Amendment 1086s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2016 Senate Journal 10
2016-03-17SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1086s, 03/24/2016; Senate Calendar 11
2016-03-02SenateHearing: 03/09/2016, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 9
2015-12-29SenateTo Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback