NH SB420 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/19/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
Pending: House Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permitting qualifying patients and designated caregivers to cultivate cannabis for therapeutic use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permitting qualifying patients and designated caregivers to cultivate cannabis for therapeutic use.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/19/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2020-03-03House==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/18/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 104
2020-03-03House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 03/17/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2020-03-02HouseIntroduced 02/20/2020 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs
2020-02-06SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/06/2020; Senate Journal 3
2020-01-30SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/06/2020; Senate Calendar 5
2020-01-16SenateHearing: 01/22/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 3
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 2

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback