NH SB420 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by the Governor on 06/03/2016; Chapter 0184; Effective 06/03/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by the Governor on 06/03/2016; Chapter 0184; Effective 06/03/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to aid to the permanently and totally disabled.
Title
Relative to aid to the permanently and totally disabled.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Sen. Jeff Woodburn [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Rep. Frank Kotowski [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] | Rep. Peter Leishman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/03/2016; Chapter 0184; Effective 06/03/2016 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-23 | House | Enrolled 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 24 |
2016-05-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 16 |
2016-05-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/11/2016 (Vote 26-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 10 |
2016-04-21 | House | Executive Session: 05/04/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2016-04-25 | House | ==CONTINUED== Division III Work Session: 04/26/2016 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2016-04-21 | House | ==RECESSED== Division III Work Session: 04/25/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred to Finance 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 7 |
2016-04-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 7 |
2016-04-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/20/2016 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 24 P. 9 |
2016-03-29 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-03-15 | House | Public Hearing: 03/22/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-03-15 | House | Introduced 03/10/2016 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 25 P. 118 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/03/2016; Senate Journal 7 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/03/2016; Senate Calendar 7 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0387s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/11/2016; Senate Journal 5 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0387s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/11/2016 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0387s, 02/11/2016; Senate Calendar 5 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/19/2016, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 2 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |