NH SB42 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-22 - Conference Committee Report: Not Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-22 - Conference Committee Report: Not Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restricting public officers from engaging in certain private dealings.
Title
Restricting public officers from engaging in certain private dealings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-22 | House | Conference Committee Report: Not Filed |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/14/2021, 09:00 am, Room 100, State House |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator Cavanaugh Replaces Senator Prentiss; Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator Prentiss Replaces Senator Cavanaugh; Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Alliegro, Roy, Yakubovich, Fellows 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 16 |
2021-06-10 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 16 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Carson, Reagan, Cavanaugh; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1281h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 8 |
2021-06-03 | House | Amendment # 2021-1281h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 8 |
2021-05-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1281h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 6 |
2021-03-24 | House | Public Hearing: 03/24/2021 01:15 pm Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/97152965622Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 4 P. 48 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/04/2021; Senate Journal 3 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/04/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 01/20/2021, 09:40 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 3 |