NH SB418 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - Senate Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.200
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - Senate Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.200
Summary
Establishing requirements for electric distribution company solicitation of proposals from renewable energy developers.
Title
Establishing requirements for electric distribution company solicitation of proposals from renewable energy developers.
Sponsors
Rep. David Borden [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Suzanne Harvey [D] | Sen. Harold Janeway [D] |
Sen. Bob Odell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Senate Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.200 | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study 3/24/10; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2010-02-10 | Senate Hearing: March 4, 2010, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 8:50 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7 | |
2010-01-06 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy, Environment and Economic Development; Senate Journal 1, Pg.14 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2788&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |