NH SB417 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 06/16/14; Chapter 0149; Effective 06/16/14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 06/16/14; Chapter 0149; Effective 06/16/14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to information provided to electric utility customers.
Title
Relative to information provided to electric utility customers.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] | Rep. Beatriz Pastor-Bodmer [D] | Sen. Russell Prescott [R] |
Rep. David Borden [D] | Sen. Jeff Woodburn [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/16/14; Chapter 0149; Effective 06/16/14 |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 5/15/2014) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-14 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 35 |
2014-04-30 | House | Continued Executive Session: 5/6/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-04-23 | House | Executive Session: 4/29/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304=RECESSED= |
2014-04-15 | House | Public Hearing: 4/22/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2014-04-01 | House | Introduced (In Recess, 3/26/14) and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1097s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1097s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1097s, New Title, 3/27/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Hearing: 3/12/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources |