NH SB416 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0130; Effective 05/30/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0130; Effective 05/30/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to transportation network company drivers.
Title
Relative to transportation network company drivers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0130; Effective 05/30/2018 |
2018-05-09 | House | Enrolled 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17 |
2018-04-26 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/26/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 4 |
2018-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/17/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-04-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/10/2018 01:45 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-28 | House | Public Hearing: 04/03/2018 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 7 P. 51 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |