NH SB416 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by the Governor on 06/03/2016; Chapter 0182; Effective 09/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to flexible working arrangements in employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to flexible working arrangements in employment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-17 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-10SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/03/2016; Chapter 0182; Effective 09/01/2016
2016-05-23SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19
2016-05-23HouseEnrolled 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 24
2016-05-11HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 153-140 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 107
2016-05-05HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate House Calendar 29 P. 25
2016-05-05HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/11/2016 (Vote 13-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 25
2016-04-27HouseExecutive Session: 05/03/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307
2016-03-30HousePublic Hearing: 04/05/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307
2016-03-29HouseIntroduced 03/23/2016 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 27 P. 68
2016-03-17SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 0945s, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/17/2016; Senate Journal 9
2016-03-17SenateSen. Prescott Moved Laid on Table, Division Vote 11Y-12N, Motion Failed; 03/17/2016; Senate Journal 9
2016-03-17SenateSen. Sanborn Moved Laid on Table, Division Vote 11Y-12N, Motion Failed; 03/17/2016; Senate Journal 9
2016-03-17SenateCommittee Amendment 0945s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2016 Senate Journal 9
2016-03-17SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2016; Senate Journal 9
2016-03-17SenatePending Motion Committee Amendment #2016-0945s; 03/17/2016; Senate Journal 9
2016-03-17SenateSen. Sanborn Moved Laid on Table, Division Vote 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 03/17/2016; Senate Journal 9
2016-03-10SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0945s, 03/17/2016; Senate Calendar 10
2016-01-13SenateHearing: 01/19/2016, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 2
2015-12-29SenateTo Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback