NH SB416 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Senate II. Remainder Effective 07/08/10
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Senate II. Remainder Effective 07/08/10
Summary
Relative to the state minimum hourly wage applicable to tipped restaurant employees.
Title
Relative to the state minimum hourly wage applicable to tipped restaurant employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Bragdon [R] | Rep. Jacalyn Cilley [D] | Rep. James Craig [D] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] |
Rep. Paul McEachern [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Senate II. Remainder Effective 07/08/10 | |
2010-07-08 | Senate I. Section 2 Effective 12/31/11 | |
2010-07-08 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/08/10; Chapter 0284 | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-06-02 | House Enrolled | |
2010-05-19 | Senate Sen. Hassan Concurs with House Amendment 1914h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2010-05-12 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1914h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1959-1960 | |
2010-05-12 | House Amendment #1914h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1959-1960 | |
2010-05-06 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #1914h; House Journal 37, PG.1766 | |
2010-05-06 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1914h for May 12 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar); House Journal 37, PG.1737 | |
2010-04-21 | House Executive Session: 5/6/2010 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2010-03-24 | House Public Hearing: 3/30/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2010-03-18 | House Introduced and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 27, PG.1441 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 10, Pg.169 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0928s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10, Pg.160 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Committee Amendment 0928s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10, Pg.160 | |
2010-03-09 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 0928s, 3/17/10; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Hearing: March 8, 2010, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 8:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2010-01-06 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce, Labor and Consumer Protection; Senate Journal 1, Pg.14 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2731&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |