NH SB415 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-09-12 - Executive Session: 09/19/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-09-12 - Executive Session: 09/19/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the penalty for certain fentanyl-related offenses.
Title
Relative to the penalty for certain fentanyl-related offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-12 | House | Executive Session: 09/19/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-09-12 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/19/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-05-02 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 35 |
2024-04-08 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 03/29/2024 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 17 |
2024-03-21 | House | Executive Session: 03/29/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-03-13 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2024 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 7 P. 110 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 18Y-6N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2024, Vote 3-2; Senate Calendar 9 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Hearing: 01/11/2024, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 2 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |