NH SB415 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring appropriate hydration be made available to certain animals and establishing a committee to study harmful weather conditions for dogs.
Title
Requiring appropriate hydration be made available to certain animals and establishing a committee to study harmful weather conditions for dogs.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. David Borden [D] | Sen. Jeanie Forrester [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] |
Rep. Michele Peckham [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2016 House Journal 36 P. 6 |
2016-04-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 04/20/2016 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 24 P. 8 |
2016-04-06 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2016-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/05/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303 |
2016-03-29 | House | Introduced 03/23/2016 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 27 P. 68 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1088s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1088s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2016 Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1088s, New Title, 03/24/2016; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Hearing: 03/09/2016, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |