NH SB415 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-01 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/1/2010; Effective 06/1/2010; Chapter 0116
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-01 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/1/2010; Effective 06/1/2010; Chapter 0116
Summary
Relative to remedies against landlords.
Title
Relative to remedies against landlords.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-01 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/1/2010; Effective 06/1/2010; Chapter 0116 | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-05-12 | House Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG.2097 | |
2010-04-28 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 36, PG.1699 | |
2010-04-21 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 28 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG.1592 | |
2010-04-13 | House Executive Session: 4/20/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2010-03-24 | House Public Hearing: 3/30/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2010-03-18 | House Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 27, PG.1441 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 10, Pg.169 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendments 0964s, 1072s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10, Pg.166 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Sen. Reynolds Floor Amendment 1072s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10, Pg.166 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Committee Amendment 0964s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10, Pg.166 | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 0964s, 3/17/10; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2010-02-10 | Senate Hearing: March 2, 2010, Room 103, State House, 2:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7 | |
2010-01-06 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1, Pg.14 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2724&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |