NH SB412 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-17 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2010; Effective 08/16/2010; Chapter 0165

Summary

Relative to the display of the POW-MIA flag.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the display of the POW-MIA flag.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-17 Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2010; Effective 08/16/2010; Chapter 0165
2010-05-05 Senate Enrolled
2010-05-05 House Enrolled; House Journal 38, PG.1914
2010-04-21 House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Division Vote 256-48; House Journal 35, PG.1689-1690
2010-04-13 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 21 (Vote 13-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 31, PG.1538
2010-03-31 House Executive Session: 4/8/2010 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 203
2010-03-23 House Public Hearing: 4/1/2010 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203
2010-03-18 House Introduced and Referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs; House Journal 27, PG.1441
2010-03-17 Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 10, Pg.169
2010-03-17 Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0919s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10, Pg.163
2010-03-17 Senate Committee Amendment 0919s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10, Pg.163
2010-03-09 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 0919s, 3/17/10; Senate Calendar 11
2010-01-13 Senate Hearing; January 19, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 3
2010-01-06 Senate Introduced and Referred to Election Law and Veterans' Affairs; Senate Journal 1, Pg.14

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback