NH SB41 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to historical racing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to historical racing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Ways and Means
2019-03-07SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0628s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0628s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0628s, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-17SenateHearing: 01/23/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 7
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback