NH SB405 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Pending Motion Sen. Giuda Floor Amendment # 2018-1094s; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Pending Motion Sen. Giuda Floor Amendment # 2018-1094s; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enabling municipalities to adopt a separate exemption against the statewide property tax for certain long-term residents.
Title
Enabling municipalities to adopt a separate exemption against the statewide property tax for certain long-term residents.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] | Sen. Gary Daniels [R] | Sen. Harold French [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] |
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Pending Motion Sen. Giuda Floor Amendment # 2018-1094s; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Laid on Table, Division Vote 17Y-6N, Motion Adopted; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Offered Floor Amendment # 2018-1094s; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1013s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1013s, 03/15/2018; Senate Calendar 12 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2018, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 1 |