NH SB404 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0233; Effective 06/17/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0233; Effective 06/17/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a supplemental nutrition assistance program.
Title
Establishing a supplemental nutrition assistance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - House - OTPA (Y: 226 N: 76 NV: 42 Abs: 45) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0233; Effective 06/17/2022 |
2022-06-09 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1386h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 226-76 05/04/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-05-05 | House | Amendment # 1386h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-04-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1386h (Vote 17-4; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-22 | House | Executive Session: 04/05/2022 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-03-29 | House | Public Hearing: 04/05/2022 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0317s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0317s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0317s, 02/03/2022; Senate Calendar 5 |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Hearing: 01/26/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 2 |
2021-12-23 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |