NH SB404 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - No Pending Motion; 03/15/2018 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Phasing out the tax on interest and dividends.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Phasing out the tax on interest and dividends.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - Senate - Lay on Table (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 11 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateNo Pending Motion; 03/15/2018 Senate Journal 8
2018-03-15SenateSen. Feltes Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 12Y-11N, Motion Adopted; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
2018-03-15SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 11Y-12N, Motion Failed; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8
2018-03-12SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/15/2018; Senate Calendar 12A
2018-02-22SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 12Y-9N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5
2018-02-14SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/22/2018; Senate Calendar 8
2018-01-30SenateHearing: 02/07/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 6
2017-12-12SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2784&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB404
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=1800&txtFormat=html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=62&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0404&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB404&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2784
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=109&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0404&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB404&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2784
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=110&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0404&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB404&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2784

Bill Comments

feedback