NH SB404 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 12-4)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 12-4)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the acquisition of real property for state government purposes.
Title
Relative to the acquisition of real property for state government purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. Marjorie Porter [D] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] |
Rep. Tracy Emerick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Interim Study Report: Not Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 12-4) |
2014-09-18 | House | Executive Session: 10/21/2014 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2014-06-09 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/24/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2014-05-06 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 5/13/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2014-04-23 | House | Refer to Interim Study Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-17 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 31 |
2014-04-09 | House | Executive Session: 4/16/14 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 201 |
2014-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 4/1/2014 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2014-03-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to Public Works and Highways |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0623s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0623s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0623s, 3/13/14; Senate Calendar 9 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Hearing: 2/11/14, Room 103, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Finance |