NH SB403 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Lay SB403 on Table (Rep. Baldasaro): Motion Adopted DV 168-158 04/21/2022 House Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Lay SB403 on Table (Rep. Baldasaro): Motion Adopted DV 168-158 04/21/2022 House Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Re-establishing the Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children (WIC) Farmers Market Nutrition Program.
Title
Re-establishing the Special Supplemental Nutrition Program for Women, Infants, and Children (WIC) Farmers Market Nutrition Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Lay SB403 on Table (Rep. Baldasaro): Motion Adopted DV 168-158 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study |
2022-04-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 14-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 17 |
2022-04-13 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2022 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2022 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/31/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Sen. Soucy Moved Ought to Pass; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/31/2022; Senate Calendar 13 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Special Order to Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/24/2022; Senate Calendar 12 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/03/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Hearing: 01/26/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 2 |
2021-12-23 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |