NH SB402 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Signed by the Governor on 04/20/2018; Chapter 0014; Effective 04/20/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Signed by the Governor on 04/20/2018; Chapter 0014; Effective 04/20/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Naming a portion of route 110 in Berlin in honor of Anthony B. Urban.
Title
Naming a portion of route 110 in Berlin in honor of Anthony B. Urban.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 04/20/2018; Chapter 0014; Effective 04/20/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-12 | House | Enrolled 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 28 |
2018-04-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 16 |
2018-03-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/05/2018 (Vote 14-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 7 |
2018-03-20 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 03/27/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 201 |
2018-03-20 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 7 P. 51 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Reconsideration on Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 22Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Special Order to the beginning of the calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/01/2018; Senate Calendar 5 |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Hearing: 01/16/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:40 pm; Senate Calendar 3 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 1 |