NH SB40 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to electronic wills.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to electronic wills.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 7
2017-04-26HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 05/04/2017 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 6
2017-04-19HouseExecutive Session: 04/25/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-04-04HousePublic Hearing: 04/18/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-04-04HouseIntroduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 11 P. 27
2017-03-29SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-1011s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11
2017-03-29SenateCommittee Amendment #2017-1011s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11
2017-03-22SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1011s, 03/29/2017; Senate Calendar 16
2017-01-26SenateHearing: 01/31/2017, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 8
2017-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback