NH SB399 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-06 - Hearing: 01/19/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 2
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing the fetal health protection act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing the fetal health protection act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-06SenateHearing: 01/19/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 2
2021-12-23SenateTo Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback