NH SB397 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-18 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-18 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the university system of New Hampshire to issue decals for multi-use decal plates.
Title
Authorizing the university system of New Hampshire to issue decals for multi-use decal plates.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-18 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved to Remove SB 397 from the Consent Calendar; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/18/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 3 |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/09/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:20 pm; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 1 |