NH SB390 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - II. Remainder Effective 07/29/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the office of solicitor general in the department of justice and establishing an unclassified attorney position in the department of justice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the office of solicitor general in the department of justice and establishing an unclassified attorney position in the department of justice.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04SenateII. Remainder Effective 07/29/2018
2018-06-04SenateI. Section 3 Effective 07/01/2019
2018-06-04SenateSigned by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0127
2018-05-09HouseEnrolled 05/03/2018
2018-05-09SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17
2018-04-26HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018
2018-04-19HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/26/2018 (Vote 26-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 5
2018-04-12HouseExecutive Session: 04/18/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-04-05HouseDivision I Work Session: 04/10/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 212
2018-04-05HouseReferred to Finance 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 5
2018-04-05HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 4
2018-03-21HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/05/2018 (Vote 12-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 4
2018-03-20HouseExecutive Session: 03/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 306
2018-03-14HousePublic Hearing: 03/20/2018 02:15 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2018-03-12HouseIntroduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 7 P. 51
2018-02-15SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2018-0505s and 2018-0564s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4
2018-02-15SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2018-0564s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4
2018-02-15SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-0505s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4
2018-02-07SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0505s, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7
2018-02-01SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3
2018-01-25SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/01/2018; Senate Calendar 5
2018-01-18SenateHearing: 01/25/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 5
2017-12-12SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback