NH SB39 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Sen. Birdsell Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment #1303h, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Sen. Birdsell Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment #1303h, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to recounts on questions and relative to photographs of voters not presenting identification.
Title
Relative to recounts on questions and relative to photographs of voters not presenting identification.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Rep. Frank Byron [R] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - House - Ought to Pass Amended (Y: 206 N: 149 NV: 11 Abs: 33) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment #1303h, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1303h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 206-149; House Journal 44, PG. 1906-1908 |
2015-06-03 | House | Amendment #1303h: Amendment Adopted DV 202-133; House Journal 44, PG. 1906 |
2015-04-23 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2015-04-23 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1303h (NT) for Jun 3 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG. 1635 |
2015-04-15 | House | Executive Session: 4/21/2015 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-04-15 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane amendment #2015-1303h: 4/21/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-04-08 | House | Continued Public Hearing: 4/14/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-04-01 | House | Public Hearing: 4/7/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308==RECESSED== |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 22, PG. 628 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 4 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 1/29/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Hearing: 1/21/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |