NH SB389 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0228; Effective 03/14/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0228; Effective 03/14/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Defining mobile service garages and relative to state vehicle inspections.
Title
Defining mobile service garages and relative to state vehicle inspections.
Sponsors
Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. Harold French [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] |
Sen. Erin Hennessey [R] | Sen. Suzanne Prentiss [D] | Rep. John Hunt [R] | Rep. George Sykes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/17/2022; Chapter 0228; Effective 03/14/2023 |
2022-06-07 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2094e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2094EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-20 | House | Executive Session: 04/26/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-04-06 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2022 10:20 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Transportation |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0432s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0432s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0432s, 02/16/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2021-12-29 | Senate | Hearing: 01/18/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 1 |
2021-12-23 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 1 |