NH SB383 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 170-164 05/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to recommend policies that will enhance access to affordable health care for all New Hampshire residents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to recommend policies that will enhance access to affordable health care for all New Hampshire residents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - Senate - ITL (Y: 170 N: 164 NV: 25 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 170-164 05/02/2018
2018-04-25HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2018-04-25HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 05/02/2018 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 10
2018-04-25House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/24/2018 Legislative Office Building 302
2018-04-18HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 04/24/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2018-04-12House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/17/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2018-04-12HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 04/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2018-04-04HousePublic Hearing: 04/11/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2018-03-27HouseIntroduced 03/22/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 10 P. 52
2018-03-22SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1097s, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10
2018-03-22SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1097s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10
2018-03-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1097s, 03/22/2018;
2018-03-21SenateSpecial Order to 03/22/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/21/2018 Senate Journal 9
2018-03-21SenateSen. Sanborn Moved to Remove SB 383 from the Consent Calendar; 03/21/2018; Senate Journal 9
2018-03-15SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1097s, 03/21/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13
2018-01-25SenateHearing: 01/30/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 5
2017-12-12SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback