NH SB381 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 07/01/2022; Chapter 0316; Effective 07/31/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 07/01/2022; Chapter 0316; Effective 07/31/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an office of the advocate for special education.
Title
Establishing an office of the advocate for special education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - House - OTPA (Y: 170 N: 155 NV: 19 Abs: 45) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/01/2022; Chapter 0316; Effective 07/31/2022 |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-22 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2022-2011c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/26/2022; Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-26 | House | Conference Committee Report 2022-2011c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-18 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2022-2011c Filed 05/16/2022; House Amendment |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/16/2022, 9:00 a.m., Room 100, State House |
2022-05-12 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Cordelli, Hobson, Litchfield 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-12 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Ward, Hennessey, Prentiss; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Ward Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1857h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 170-155 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-05-04 | House | Amendment # 1857h: Amendment Adopted DV 163-152 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-04-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1857h (Vote 15-6; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-27 | House | Division Work Session: 04/27/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2022-04-22 | House | Division Work Session: 04/25/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2022-04-22 | House | Executive Session: 04/27/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-04-21 | House | Referred to Finance 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-21 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/21/2022 House Journal 10 |
2022-04-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study |
2022-04-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 13 |
2022-04-04 | House | Executive Session: 04/13/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/11/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-03-28 | House | Introduced 03/28/2022 and referred to Education |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/24/2022; Senate Calendar 12 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/16/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Hearing: 01/25/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 2 |
2021-12-21 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1 |