NH SB374 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - Sen. Boutin Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1694h; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - Sen. Boutin Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1694h; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to review and make recommendations to standardize and make uniform the definitions of "domicile" and "residency" in state statutes.
Title
Establishing a commission to review and make recommendations to standardize and make uniform the definitions of "domicile" and "residency" in state statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-14 - House - OTPA (Y: 164 N: 124 NV: 69 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Boutin Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1694h; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1694h Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 164-124 |
2014-05-14 | House | Amendment #2014-1694h Amendment Adopted Div 176-112 |
2014-05-08 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2014-05-08 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1694h (Vote 10-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 35 |
2014-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 5/1/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-04-16 | House | Executive Session: 4/22/2014 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 RECESSED to 4/24/2014 11:00 Amendment |
2014-04-09 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/16/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-03-25 | House | Public Hearing: 4/3/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-03-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to Election Law |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Special Ordered to the call of the Chair, Without Objection, Motion Adopted |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/13/14; Senate Calendar 9 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Hearing: 3/5/14, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs |