NH SB373 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-15 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-15 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
Summary
Relative to approval of alternative schools by the state board of education.
Title
Relative to approval of alternative schools by the state board of education.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Harold Janeway [D] | Sen. Molly Kelly [D] | Rep. Amanda Merrill [D] |
Rep. Judith Reever [D] | Rep. Emma Rous [D] | Sen. Margaret Wood Hassan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-15 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2010-05-12 | House Referred to the Education Committee for Interim Study | |
2010-05-12 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1953 | |
2010-05-04 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for May 12 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Journal 37, PG.1735 | |
2010-04-21 | House Executive Session: 5/4/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2010-03-23 | House Public Hearing: 4/6/2010 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2010-02-17 | House Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 18, PG.1016 | |
2010-02-03 | Senate Passed By Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 5, Pg.65 | |
2010-02-03 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5, Pg.62 | |
2010-01-27 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass 2/3/10; Senate Calendar 5 | |
2010-01-14 | Senate Hearing; January 26, 2010, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 11:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 3 | |
2010-01-06 | Senate Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Education Committee; Senate Journal 1, Pg.8 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2773&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |