NH SB371 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2012; Chapter 0158; Effective 01/01/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2012; Chapter 0158; Effective 01/01/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing a lien for labor and materials for professional design services.
Title
Allowing a lien for labor and materials for professional design services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2012; Chapter 0158; Effective 01/01/2013 | |
2012-05-30 | House Enrolled [Recessed from 5/17/2012 Session]; House Journal 46, PG.2495 | |
2012-05-23 | Senate Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Senate Sen. Prescott Concurs with House Amendment 1645h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; | |
2012-05-09 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1645h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.2232 | |
2012-05-09 | House Amendment #1645h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.2232 | |
2012-05-02 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-1645h; House Calendar 36, PG.2027-2028 | |
2012-05-02 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1645h for May 9 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 36, PG.2008 | |
2012-04-17 | House Full Committee Work Session: 5/1/2012 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 ==Executive Session To Follow== | |
2012-04-17 | House Full Committee Work Session: 4/24/2012 2:45 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2012-03-27 | House Public Hearing: 4/10/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 ==Banking/Business Div== | |
2012-03-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 23, PG.1448 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0811s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6, Pg.154 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Committee Amendment 0811s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6, Pg.153 | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-0811s, New Title, 3/7/12; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2012-01-12 | Senate Hearing: 1/17/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:10 a.m.; Senate Calendar 3 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1, Pg.14 |