NH SB37 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/28/2019 11:01 am Legislative Office Building 203
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Hearing: May 28 @ 11:01 am in Legislative Office Building 203
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the registration of motor vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the registration of motor vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/28/2019 11:01 am Legislative Office Building 203
2019-05-01House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 05/14/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2019-04-10House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/16/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203
2019-03-26HousePublic Hearing: 04/02/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 11 P. 68
2019-01-31SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/31/2019; Senate Journal 4
2019-01-23SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/31/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-17SenateHearing: 01/22/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 7
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback