NH SB37 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Signed by the Governor on 07/05/2017; Chapter 0198; Effective 09/03/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Signed by the Governor on 07/05/2017; Chapter 0198; Effective 09/03/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to tip pooling.
Title
Relative to tip pooling.
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Daniels [R] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Rep. Michael O'Brien [D] | Sen. Harold French [R] |
Rep. Daniel Sullivan [D] | Rep. Michael Sylvia [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - Senate - Concur (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/05/2017; Chapter 0198; Effective 09/03/2017 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-22 | House | Enrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 23 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19 |
2017-06-01 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1560h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 22 |
2017-06-01 | House | Amendment #2017-1560h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 22 |
2017-05-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1560h (NT) for 06/01/2017 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 10 |
2017-05-10 | House | Executive Session: 05/17/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-05-03 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/09/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-05-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/09/2017 11:45 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-04-19 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/26/2017 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-04-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/18/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-04-05 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/12/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-03-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/28/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-03-08 | House | Public Hearing: 03/15/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced 02/16/2017 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 8 P. 45 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-0487s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-0487s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0487s, 02/23/2017; Senate Calendar 11 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Hearing: 01/25/2017, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 4 |