NH SB365 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Vetoed by Governor 06/19/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the use of renewable generation to provide fuel diversity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the use of renewable generation to provide fuel diversity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 225 N: 108 NV: 26 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1084s (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateVetoed by Governor 06/19/2018
2018-05-29SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-29HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-05-10SenateSen. Avard Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17
2018-05-03HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1701h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 225-108 05/03/2018
2018-05-03HouseAmendment # 2018-1701h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018
2018-04-26HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2018-04-26HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1701h (NT) for 05/02/2018 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 24
2018-04-26HouseExecutive Session: 04/24/2018 Legislative Office Building 304
2018-04-18HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/24/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2018-04-10HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/18/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2018-03-28House==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 04/11/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2018-03-27HouseIntroduced 03/22/2018 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 10 P. 52
2018-03-21SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1084s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2018; Senate Journal 9
2018-03-21SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1084s, Regular Calendar 17Y-4N, Amendment Adopted; 03/21/2018; Senate Journal 9
2018-03-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1084s, 03/21/2018; Senate Calendar 13
2018-02-20SenateHearing: 03/06/2016, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 9
2017-12-12SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2720&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB365
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=1736&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1736
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=1736
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=133&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0365&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB365&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2720
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=219&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=SB0365&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB365&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2720

Bill Comments

feedback