NH SB365 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to traffic control measures.
Title
Relative to traffic control measures.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Alan Cohen [D] | Rep. Michael Vose [R] | Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Rep. David Hess [R] | Sen. Jerry Little [R] | Rep. Chris True [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/24/2016; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Hearing: 02/17/2016, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2015-12-29 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |