NH SB36 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/02/2011; Effective 06/02/2011; Chapter 0122
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/02/2011; Effective 06/02/2011; Chapter 0122
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the permanent siting of the Hampton-Exeter District Court.
Title
Relative to the permanent siting of the Hampton-Exeter District Court.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/02/2011; Effective 06/02/2011; Chapter 0122 | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 19, Pg.395 | |
2011-05-25 | House Enrolled; House Journal 46, PG.1609 | |
2011-05-18 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1534 | |
2011-05-11 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 18 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG.1320 | |
2011-04-27 | House Executive Session: 5/3/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-04-14 | House Full Committee Work Session: 4/26/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-03-29 | House Public Hearing: 4/14/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-02-16 | House Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 19, Pg. 438 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution, Senate Journal 6, Pg.61 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg, Senate Journal 5, Pg.56 | |
2011-02-08 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/16/2011; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2011-01-26 | Senate Hearing: 2/3/2011, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary, Senate Journal 3, Pg.32 |