NH SB358 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Conference Committee Report: Not Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-08 - Conference Committee Report: Not Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the joint legislative committee on administrative rules.
Title
Relative to the joint legislative committee on administrative rules.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] | Rep. Tom Dolan [R] | Rep. David Lundgren [R] |
Rep. Douglas Thomas [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Conference Committee Report: Not Filed |
2022-05-17 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Turcotte Replaces Rep. Sytek 05/17/2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/18/2022, 8:00 a.m., Room 103, State House |
2022-05-12 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Goley, Alliegro, Sytek 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-12 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Reagan, Carson, Cavanaugh; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1645h: Motion Adopted DV 208-123 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-05-04 | House | Amendment # 1645h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-27 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-04-27 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1645h (NT) (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-27 | House | Executive Session: 04/12/2022 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2022-1229h: 04/12/2022 01:50 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/12/2022 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/16/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Hearing: 02/02/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2021-12-17 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |