NH SB353 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Signed by the Governor on 07/21/2014; Chapter 0248; Effective 07/21/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Signed by the Governor on 07/21/2014; Chapter 0248; Effective 07/21/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Recodifying RSA 168-B, relative to surrogacy.
Title
Recodifying RSA 168-B, relative to surrogacy.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. James MacKay [D] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] |
Sen. David Pierce [D] | Rep. Mary Wallner [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/21/2014; Chapter 0248; Effective 07/21/2014 |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 5/15/2014) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2014-1804e Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #1804eba Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Sen. Carson Concurs with House Amendment #1310h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-04-23 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1310h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-23 | House | Amendment #1310h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1310h (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 31 |
2014-04-09 | House | Executive Session: 4/16/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 4/8/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-03-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0716s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0716s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0716s, 3/6/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Hearing: === ROOM CHANGE === 2/18/14, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Hearing: 2/18/14, Room 100, State House, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Judiciary |