NH SB350 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Executive Session: 10/16/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building205
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to biological products dispensed by pharmacists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to biological products dispensed by pharmacists.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-20HouseExecutive Session: 10/16/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building205
2018-04-26HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018
2018-04-18HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1523h
2018-04-18HouseMajority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 04/26/2018 (Vote 16-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 13
2018-04-11HouseExecutive Session: 04/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2018-04-03House==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 04/11/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2018-03-27HouseIntroduced 03/22/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 10 P. 52
2018-03-22SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2018-1096s and 2018-1125s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10
2018-03-22SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2018-1125s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10
2018-03-22SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1096s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10
2018-03-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1096s, 03/22/2018;
2018-03-21SenateSpecial Order to 03/22/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/21/2018 Senate Journal 9
2018-03-21SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Remove SB 350 from the Consent Calendar; 03/21/2018; Senate Journal 9
2018-03-15SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1096s, 03/21/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13
2018-03-07SenateHearing: 03/13/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 11
2017-12-14SenateTo Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback