NH SB350 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-19 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/17/2012; Chapter 0290; Effective 09/15/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the sale of portable electronics insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the sale of portable electronics insurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-27 - Senate - Motion to Concur (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-19 Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/17/2012; Chapter 0290; Effective 09/15/2012
2012-06-27 Senate Enrolled
2012-06-27 House Enrolled; House Journal 53, PG.2658
2012-06-27 Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2012-2513e Adopted
2012-06-27 House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2513e Adopted; House Journal 53, PG.2657
2012-06-27 Senate Sen. Carson Concurs with House Amendment #2484h, Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 23Y-0N
2012-06-06 House Third Reading (Rep Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.2593
2012-06-06 House Ought to Pass with Amendment #2484h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.2590-2593
2012-06-06 House Floor Amendment #2012-2484h (Rep Hunt): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.2590-2593
2012-06-06 House Reconsideration of Ought to Pass (Rep Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.2590
2012-06-06 House Rules Suspension to Allow Bill to be Reconsidered Past the Deadline for Action and, if Adopted, Immediate Third Reading (Rep Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote By Necessary Two-Thirds Vote; House Journal 51, PG.2590
2012-05-17 House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.2477
2012-05-15 House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Hunt); House Journal 43, PG.2282
2012-05-08 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 15 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 37, PG.2031
2012-04-17 House Full Committee Work Session: 5/1/2012 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 ==Executive Session To Follow==
2012-04-17 House Full Committee Work Session: 4/24/2012 2:45 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2012-04-17 House Public Hearing: 4/24/2012 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2012-03-29 House Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 32, PG. 1914
2012-03-28 Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1340s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8, Pg.327
2012-03-28 Senate Sen. Prescott Floor Amendment #2012-1340s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote
2012-03-28 Senate Sen. Prescott moved Ought to Pass; Senate Journal 8, Pg.272
2012-03-28 Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.272
2012-03-28 Senate Sen. Prescott Moved Remove SB 350 From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.272
2012-02-15 Senate Sen. Sanborn Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 5, Pg.129
2012-02-15 Senate Inexpedient to Legislate Not Voted On; Senate Journal 5, Pg.129
2012-02-09 Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 2/15/12; Senate Calendar 7
2012-01-19 Senate Hearing: 1/24/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 4
2012-01-01 Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1, Pg.13

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback